open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:6:19-cv-00040
    Party Name:Bakra v. Nicholus Garfeild / Workforce Solutions
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Roseboro Notice]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [70 Day Notice Letter Sent]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115676
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =