open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00045
    Party Name:Employers Resource Management Company v. Blizzard Transportation, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Letter]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115670
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =