open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:19-cv-00442
    Party Name:Seago-Blanton v. Unknown
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reopening Case]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Respond]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner Condfil]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out - District (closes case)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115691
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =