U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 21, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • October 17, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • October 07, 2019: [Downward Departure]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 21, 2019: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • June 21, 2019: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • June 18, 2019: [Factual Basis]
  • June 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 18, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.