U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gil-Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • July 26, 2019: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • July 02, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Joint Order Filed]
  • June 25, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • June 18, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.