open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:19-cv-00494
    Party Name:Anderson v. Lee, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Fee]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Evidence]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner Condfil]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Assets]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115951
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =