open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:19-cv-00495
    Party Name:Ball v. Asbury
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner 28:1915]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Fee]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Respond - Prisoner]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner Condfil]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115950
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =