open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:19-cv-00618
    Party Name:Anderson v. Newman et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Document]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Evidence]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Respond - Prisoner]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Fee]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner Condfil]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116507
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =