open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00052
    Party Name:Basham v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expert Discovery Report]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Records - Paper]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Requesting State Court Record]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116523
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =