open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:19-cv-00614
    Party Name:Montgomery v. Augusta Stanton Paramedics and Rescue Squad et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opinion - Jones]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Respond - Prisoner]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Fee]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner Condfil]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Evidence]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Assets]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116510
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =