open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia
    Case Number:19-36043-
    Party Name:Steven A Hood and Kathy J Hood
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Request for Notice/Service (Claimant Users Only)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Case Closed - Chapter 7 Full Administration]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerCocTyp - BNC Certificate of Mailing of Discharge of Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 Only)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - 2nd Ntc of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Certification of Completion of Postpetition Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [BNC Forms Request Notice of Requirement to File Certification About a Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Meeting of Creditors Adjourned]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), List(s) - NO FEE]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Order to Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual/Joint]
    Date Published:November 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [none]
    Date Published:November 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:November 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:November 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:November 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vaeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?715578
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =