open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia
    Case Number:19-51667-
    Party Name:Penisha Lavea Richardson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Amended Order Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [BNC certificate of mailing]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Chapter 13 Confirmation Letter (NOR/NN Only)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Hearing Cancelled (Norfolk and Newport News Divisions ONLY)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [BNC certificate of mailing of order]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Order on Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Hearing held; motion granted]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Reschedule Hearing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Dismissing Pleading for Failure to Prosecute]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [CerDocTyp - Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [BNC Forms Request (VAN-024) Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Failure to Prosecute Notice Request]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Notice of Scheduled Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Hearing continued]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Hearing held; motion denied.]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Approve]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Trustee's Recommendation]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Certification of Completion of Postpetition Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), List(s) - NO FEE]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Certification re: Compliance with Requirements of 11 U.S.C. Section 1325]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [CerDocTyp - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [none]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [**Chapter 13 Plan and Related Motions]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stackhouse, R. Clinton [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [**Chapter 13 Plan and Related Motions]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vaeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?715584
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =