open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:20-cv-00111
    Party Name:Winslow v. Davis
  • Filing Type:Civil [Roseboro Notice]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Habeas Petition]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner Service (2254)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118188
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =