U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boothe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • October 09, 2020: [Alter Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Substantial Assistance]
  • September 29, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 27, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 25, 2020: [Substantial Assistance]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 13, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Objections]
  • July 15, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
  • February 26, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 24, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Appearance Bond]
  • February 24, 2020: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • February 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • February 24, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 24, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.