U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • May 09, 2025: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • May 09, 2025: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • May 09, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Disclosure]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Substantial Assistance]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Substantial Assistance]
  • November 23, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 04, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Presentencing Order - Moon]
  • August 02, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • August 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • February 25, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Joint Order Filed]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • March 04, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • February 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 28, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 28, 2020: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.