open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:6:20-cr-00008-1
    Party Name:USA v Simpson, et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Person Appearance Rights]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119345
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =