U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guzman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 13, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • December 09, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • November 18, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Cancelled]
  • August 09, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order to Continue Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • February 05, 2021: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • February 05, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • February 05, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • January 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 07, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • January 06, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • September 09, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Joint Order Filed]
  • August 03, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Pretrial Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 31, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 30, 2020: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 29, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 29, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.