U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Washington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 30, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.