U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00013-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Parson, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • September 07, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Final Amended]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 13, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • March 10, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • March 09, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 21, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons]
  • December 20, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2021: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 05, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 05, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • November 05, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • November 05, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 11 Hearing]
  • November 05, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 04, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • November 04, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 11 Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 04, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • November 04, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • October 19, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Fixing Trial Procedures]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Superseding Indictment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • June 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 27, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 16, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Bond]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Fixing Trial Procedures]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 27, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 25, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • August 21, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 13, 2020: [Appearance Bond]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 12, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 07, 2020: [Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • August 06, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 06, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Arrest]
  • August 05, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 05, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.