open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00046
    Party Name:Mahmood v. Truist Bank et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief / Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief /Memorandum]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Records - Paper]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Requesting State Court Record]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119745
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =