open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:20-cv-00457
    Party Name:Bauserman v. Commissioner Andrew Saul of the Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119744
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =