open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00019
    Party Name:Bentley v. Aiken et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Requesting State Court Record]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119759
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =