U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 31, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • July 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 23, 2021: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • July 13, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • July 09, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • March 29, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • March 26, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Cancelled]
  • March 25, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 24, 2021: [Strike]
  • March 09, 2021: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Pretrial Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice (NextGen)]
  • September 23, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2020: [Joint Order Filed]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • September 10, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • September 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 10, 2020: [Arrest]
  • September 10, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • August 28, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 26, 2020: [Disclosure]
  • August 26, 2020: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.