U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:98-cr-70076-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Smallwood, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Waiver of Hearing to Modify Conditions of Prob or SR]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Instructions to the Defendant]
  • March 12, 2021: [Instructions to the Garnishee]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice by Clerk of Post Judgment Garnishment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 02, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.