U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ehtesham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • January 27, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 21, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • January 21, 2021: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • November 06, 2020: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 05, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 05, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • November 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 30, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • October 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 30, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.