U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00064-2
  • Case Name: USA v Hartage, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 01, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 15, 2022: [Seal]
  • November 14, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 01, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • October 17, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • October 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2022: [In Person Appearance Rights]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 04, 2022: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • August 04, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • June 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 03, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Fixing Trial Procedures]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 25, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • October 25, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 14, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 04, 2020: [Joint Order Filed]
  • December 01, 2020: [Pretrial Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • November 30, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 30, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2020: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 23, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • November 20, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 13, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.