U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00063-2
  • Case Name: USA v Wright et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Reducing Sentence - Amendment 821]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 17, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • September 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 19, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • August 18, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 07, 2022: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • June 06, 2022: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 06, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • June 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • June 06, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • December 06, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 29, 2021: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • July 29, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 29, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • June 22, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2021: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • June 21, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2021: [Early Release of Jencks]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • December 16, 2020: [Discovery]
  • December 16, 2020: [Disclosure]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • December 14, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • December 14, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • December 14, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 09, 2020: [Discovery]
  • December 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 25, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 10, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • November 09, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2020: [Discovery]
  • November 06, 2020: [Disclosure]
  • November 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2020: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.