U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tremblay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • June 20, 2021: [Joinder]
  • June 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 16, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • June 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Substantial Assistance]
  • June 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Substantial Assistance]
  • June 09, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • January 21, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • January 07, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • December 09, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • December 09, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • December 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.