U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00005-2
  • Case Name: USA v Calloway et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Transfer Out Supervised Releasee/Probationer]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 09, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • February 07, 2022: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • February 01, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • February 01, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 13, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • January 05, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2022: [Factual Basis]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • December 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Bond Violation]
  • December 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Warrant]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • November 24, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 24, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Fixing Trial Procedures]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2021: [In Limine]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • August 12, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 12, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Release of Jencks]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Early Release of Jencks]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 12, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • March 16, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Joint Order Filed]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • February 24, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • February 24, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • February 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • February 16, 2021: [Joint Order Filed]
  • February 12, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 10, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • February 10, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 09, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • February 08, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • February 08, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.