U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burnette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • May 02, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 30, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 05, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • April 01, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • March 04, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2021: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • June 16, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 12, 2021: [Joint Order Filed]
  • April 12, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • April 09, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 25, 2021: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.