U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • November 08, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 01, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Docket Entry & Document - use with another selection]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Joint Order Filed]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • May 17, 2021: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • May 17, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 06, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
  • April 22, 2021: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.