U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grizzle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 12, 2021: [Downward Departure]
  • August 05, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • August 02, 2021: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • May 13, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 13, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.