U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haislip et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Prisoner Service (2255)]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Vacate (2255)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 05, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 28, 2022: [USCA Order]
April, 2022
  • April 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • April 22, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Requirement to file AUTH 24]
  • February 18, 2022: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • February 09, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • February 03, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • February 03, 2022: [Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • February 02, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment to 4CCA]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 18, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • January 14, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • January 11, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • November 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 12, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 05, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 23, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • June 08, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 21, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 18, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 18, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 17, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2021: [Response]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order to Respond]
  • May 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 10, 2021: [Discovery]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 30, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Enhanced Punishment]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 29, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • April 29, 2021: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment]
  • April 29, 2021: [Minute Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.