U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 18, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • October 04, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 01, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • August 01, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 01, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 01, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Joint Order Filed]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 01, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • September 01, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 26, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • August 26, 2021: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Indictment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.