U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDonald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for New trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
  • April 09, 2025: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [New Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 31, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.