U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DELK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • October 12, 2021: [Joint Order Filed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 07, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • October 07, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.