U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brief /Memorandum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • March 31, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • March 20, 2025: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 15, 2025: [Factual Basis/Statement of Facts]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Discovery]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 29, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • November 23, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 25, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.