U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lawrence
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss (Petty Offense)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Dismiss (Petty Offense)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Acknowledgment Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order-Ballou PO TUA]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • February 22, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge - Petty Offense]
  • February 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Petty Offense]
  • February 22, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing - Petty Offense]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Violation Notice Issued or PO Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.