U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-mj-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamonde
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [MJ Case Merged]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 28, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • November 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.