U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abolarinwa
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • June 08, 2022: [Transcript Request]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • January 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) - Complaint/Indictment - Other District]
  • January 13, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arrest - 5(c)(3)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Charging Documents from District of Offense - Rule 5(c)(3)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.