U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hood
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [MJ Case Merged]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.