U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shumate
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [MJ Case Merged]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
February, 2022
  • February 26, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 08, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • February 03, 2022: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • February 01, 2022: [Disclosure]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Transcript Request]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 26, 2022: [CJA 7 - Order Terminating Counsel AND-OR Distribution of Funds]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.