U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Transcript Copy Delivered]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 11, 2022: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • February 11, 2022: [Transcript Request]
  • February 03, 2022: [Transcript Request]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • January 27, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) - Complaint/Indictment - Other District]
  • January 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • January 26, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • January 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest - 5(c)(3)]
  • January 26, 2022: [Charging Documents from District of Offense - Rule 5(c)(3)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.