U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-po-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Petty Offense]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Violation Notice Issued or PO Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.