U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Disclosure]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 03, 2023: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 15, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 10, 2022: [Letter/Request]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 03, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • July 20, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.