U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franklin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Appearance Bond]
  • January 03, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 28, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • December 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • December 28, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
  • December 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Additional Evidence]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 03, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • October 14, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • July 31, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • July 26, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • July 26, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 26, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 26, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.