U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKinney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Release from Custody]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Bond]
  • September 22, 2022: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 21, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 19, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 19, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 30, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • August 30, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.