U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stidham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • December 06, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 16, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2022: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • August 08, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.