U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:10-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 10, 2023: [Court Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Vacate]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.