U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:11-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirkland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Instructions to the Defendant]
  • August 09, 2022: [Instructions to the Garnishee]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice by Clerk of Post Judgment Garnishment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.